MS HB1077 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 11-53-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "open Account"; To Require An Open Account Creditor To Send A Demand To The Current Address Of An Account Debtor Through Certain Means; To Provide That The Account Debtor Shall Be Liable For Expenses And Costs In Addition To Attorney's Fees; To Bring Forward Section 11-53-67, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To Producing A Bill For Fee Payment, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Open account; revise definition and require account creditor to send demand to current address of account debtor through certain means.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Died On Calendar |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2021-03-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,McCaughn,Barrett |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Turner,Aguirre,Yancey |
2021-03-18 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-02-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Turner, Aguirre, Hood) |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 53 | 67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 53 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |