MS HB1072 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Nonviolent Habitual Offender May Be Eligible For Parole If The Sentencing Judge Authorizes The Offender To Be Eligible For Parole Consideration Under Certain Circumstances; To Provide That No Person Shall Be Eligible For Parole Who Is Convicted Of An Offense That Specifically Prohibits Parole Release; To Provide That Except For A Violent Habitual Offender, An Offender Who Is Convicted Of A Capital Offense And Sentenced To Life Imprisonment Without Parole Eligibility Or Any Other Offender Who Is Convicted Of An Offense That Specifically Prohibits Parole Release, A Person Convicted After June 30, 1995, Of A Violent Crime Or Sex Offense Shall Be Eligible For Parole After Serving 50% Of The Sentence Or Sentences Imposed By The Trial Court Or 20 Years, Whichever Is Less; To Provide That If A Person Is Convicted After June 30, 1995, Of A Nonviolent Crime And Has Served 25% Of His Or Her Sentence Imposed By The Trial Court, Or 10 Years, Whichever Is Less, Then Such Person Shall Be Eligible For Parole; To Amend Section 47-7-3.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If A Parole Eligible Inmate Is Admitted To The Department Of Corrections On Or After July 1, 2020, Then The Inmate Shall Be Provided With A Case Plan Within 90 Days Of Admission; To Provide That If A Parole Eligible Inmate Is Admitted To The Department Of Corrections Before July 1, 2020, The Department Must Complete The Case Plan By January 1, 2021; To Provide That If A Parole Eligible Inmate Is Admitted To The Department's Custody Before July 1, 2020, The Department Must Ensure That The Inmate's Case Plan Is Achievable Before The Inmate's Parole Eligibility Date Or Next Parole Hearing Date; To Amend Section 47-7-3.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove Certain Offenses That Prohibit An Inmate From Being Released By The Department Until The Inmate Has Served 50% Of A Sentence For A Crime Of Violence Or 25% For Any Other Sentence Imposed By A Court; To Amend Section 47-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require An Affirmative Vote Of At Least Three Members Of The Parole Board To Grant Parole To An Inmate Convicted After June 30, 1995, Of A Crime Of Violence; To Amend Section 47-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require An Affirmative Vote Of At Least Four Parole Board Members To Grant Parole To An Inmate Convicted Of Capital Murder Or A Sex Offense; To Require An Affirmative Vote Of At Least Three Parole Board Members To Grant Parole For An Inmate Convicted, After June 30, 1995, Of A Crime Of Violence; To Amend Section 47-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Section 47-7-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Parole Board To Order Certain Mental Examinations When It Is Necessary To Make A Parole Decision; To Provide That A Victim Or A Designated Family Member, Upon Request, Shall Be Provided An Opportunity To Be Heard By The Board Before It Makes A Decision Regarding Parole Release; To Amend Section 47-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A Hearing Be Held By The Parole Board Before An Inmate Convicted Of A Sex Offense Or Crime Of Violence May Be Released On Parole; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-33.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Pertains To Offender Discharge Plans, Is Brought Forward For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole eligibility; revise for certain offenses and require Parole Board hearing before release of certain inmates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseDied In Committee
2020-02-14HouseReferred To Corrections;Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback