MS HB1067 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Any Person Admitted To The Practice Of Law In Mississippi To Observe Youth Court Hearings As Long As The Person Signs An Oath Of Confidentiality; To Require The Mississippi Judicial College To Prepare The Oath For Youth Court; To Provide That In All Hearings In Youth Court, A Complete Record Of Evidence Shall Be Taken By Stenographic Reporting; To Amend Section 43-21-261, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Youth Courts To Provide To The Administrative Office Of Courts, On A Monthly Basis, Cumulative Data That Provides Certain Nonidentifying Information Pertaining To Cases In The Court; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth court; revise who may attend hearings and require to send certain monthly cumulative data to Administrative Office of Courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateDied On Calendar
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-27SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-12HouseAmended
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-31HouseDR - TSDP: JA To YF
2019-01-29HouseDR - TSDP: YF To JA
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Youth and Family Affairs;Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback