MS HB1067 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 59-1-42, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Limit And Regulate The Liability Of Vessel Pilots; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Vessel pilots; limit and regulate liability of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 82 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-04-03 | DR - TSDPAA: JA To PI | |
2012-03-29 | DR - TSDP: PI To JA | |
2012-03-26 | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources;Judiciary, Division A | |
2012-03-15 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-13 | Amended | |
2012-03-13 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Ports, Harbors and Airports |