MS HB1065 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize An Income Tax Job Credit For Enterprises That Are Primarily Engaged In Providing Inland Water Transportation Of Cargo On Lakes, Rivers And Intracoastal Waterways For Each Full-time Employee Employed By The Enterprise In A Mississippi Full-time Job; To Provide The Amount Of Such Credit; To Limit The Amount Of The Credit That May Be Claimed In Any One Year; To Authorize Any Tax Credit Claimed But Not Used In Any Taxable Year To Be Carried Forward For Five Consecutive Years; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; authorize a job tax credit for certain water transportation enterprises.

Sponsors

Rep. Kevin Ford [R]Rep. Oscar Denton [D]Rep. Shane Aguirre [R]Rep. Jeramey Anderson [D]
Rep. Otis Anthony [N]Rep. William Arnold [R]Rep. Willie Bailey [D]Rep. Nick Bain [D]
Rep. Earle Banks [D]Rep. David Baria [D]Rep. Shane Barnett [R]Rep. Manly Barton [R]
Rep. Donnie Bell [D]Rep. Christopher Bell [D]Rep. Edward Blackmon [D]Rep. Scott Bounds [R]
Rep. Randy Boyd [R]Rep. Clara Burnett [D]Rep. Larry Byrd [R]Rep. Credell Calhoun [D]
Rep. Lester Carpenter [R]Rep. Gary Chism [R]Rep. Bryant Clark [D]Rep. Alyce Clarke [D]
Rep. Angela Cockerham [D]Rep. John Corley [R]Rep. Dana Criswell [R]Rep. Becky Currie [R]
Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D]Rep. Jarvis Dortch [D]Rep. Michael Evans [D]Rep. Bob Evans [D]
Rep. John Faulkner [D]Rep. Karl Gibbs [D]Rep. Debra Gibbs [D]Rep. Jeffrey Guice [R]
Rep. Jeff Hale [R]Rep. Jeffery Harness [N]Rep. Ashley Henley [R]Rep. John Hines [D]
Rep. Gregory Holloway [D]Rep. Steve Hopkins [R]Rep. Kevin Horan [D]Rep. Abe Hudson [D]
Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D]Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Kabir Karriem [D]Rep. Bill Kinkade [R]
Rep. Timmy Ladner [R]Rep. John Lamar [R]Rep. Vince Mangold [R]Rep. Steve Massengill [R]
Rep. Doug McLeod [R]Rep. Roun McNeal [R]Rep. Nolan Mettetal [R]Rep. Carl Mickens [D]
Rep. Tom Miles [D]Rep. Sam Mims [R]Rep. Ken Morgan [R]Rep. Karl Oliver [R]
Rep. Randall Patterson [D]Rep. Bill Pigott [R]Rep. Brent Powell [R]Rep. John Read [R]
Rep. Rob Roberson [R]Rep. Margaret Rogers [R]Rep. Ray Rogers [R]Rep. Tracey Rosebud [D]
Rep. Randal Rushing [R]Rep. Noah Sanford [R]Rep. Donnie Scoggin [R]Rep. Fred Shanks [R]
Rep. Greg Snowden [R]Rep. Gary Staples [R]Rep. Jody Steverson [R]Rep. Preston Sullivan [D]
Rep. Kathy Sykes [D]Rep. Cheikh Taylor [D]Rep. Mark Tullos [R]Rep. Jerry Turner [R]
Rep. Price Wallace [R]Rep. Percy Watson [D]Rep. Tom Weathersby [R]Rep. Jason White [R]
Rep. Stacey Wilkes [R]Rep. Sonya Williams-Barnes [D]Rep. Patricia Willis [R]Rep. Charles Young [D]
Rep. Greg Haney [R]

Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-19SenatePassed
2019-03-18SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-20SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback