MS HB1060 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 31-5-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Threshold For Performance Bonds In Public Works Contracts From $25,000.00 To $75,000.00; To Provide That For Any Contract With The State Which Exceeds $5,000.00, Or With A County, City Or Other Public Authority Which Exceeds $75,000.00, For The Construction, Alteration, Or Repair Of Any Public Building Or Public Work, If A Subcontractor Of The General Contractor For The Contract Does Not Have General Liability Insurance Coverage In The Required Minimum Amount, Then The General Contractor Shall Be Liable For Any Amount Under Such Minimum Amount Of Coverage For Which The Subcontractor Is Underinsured Or Not Insured; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Performance bonds; increase threshold amount in public works contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-14 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02SenateDied In Committee
2024-03-21SenateReferred To Finance
2024-03-18HouseTransmitted To Senate
2024-03-14HousePassed As Amended
2024-03-14HouseAmended
2024-03-13HouseRead the Third Time
2024-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2024-02-08HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31551Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback