MS HB1059 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 27-103-125, 27-103-139 And 27-103-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Percentage Limitation On Legislative Appropriations From The State General Fund For Fiscal Years 2011 And 2012; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Certain Amounts To The Budget Contingency Fund From The State General Fund And Certain Special Funds During Fiscal Years 2010 And 2011; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Certain Amounts To The Budget Contingency Fund During Fiscal Year 2011 From Any Funds To The Credit Of Certain Agencies If The Federal Government Extends The Increased Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (fmap) Provided For In The American Recovery And Reinvestment Act Of 2009 Beyond December 31, 2010; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Specified Sums To Certain Agencies And Funds From The Amount That Was Transferred To The Budget Contingency Fund; To Authorize The Agencies And Funds To Which The Funds Are Transferred To Escalate Their Budgets And Expend Those Funds For The Purposes Authorized By Law; To Amend Section 43-13-407, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Requirement For Repayment To The Health Care Trust Fund Of A Certain Amount That Was Transferred From The Trust Fund To The Health Care Expendable Fund During Fiscal Year 2005; To Transfer One Hundred Twelve Million Dollars From The Health Care Trust Fund To The Health Care Expendable Fund In Fiscal Year 2011; To Amend Sections 27-7-309, 27-65-33 And 27-67-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Require The Early Payment Of Withholding, Sales And Use Tax Liability By Certain Taxpayers, To Delay Until 2012 The Implementation Of The Increase In The Amount Of The Average Monthly Liability That Triggers The Requirement For Early Payment; To Amend Section 65-37-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delay The Requirement For Appropriations To The Local System Bridge Replacement And Rehabilitation Program; To Amend Section 25-9-141, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish An Annual Limit On The State Agency Assessment By The State Personnel Board; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State funds; provide for transfers of funds and delay of certain payments and provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-21 Approved by Governor
2010-05-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-29 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-21 Conference Report Adopted
2010-04-21 Conference Report Adopted
2010-04-21 Conference Report Filed
2010-04-21 Conference Report Filed
2010-03-25 Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121
2010-03-18 Conferees Named Nunnelee,Davis,Hyde-Smith
2010-03-17 Conferees Named Stringer,Brown,Sullivan
2010-03-16 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2010-03-08 Returned For Concurrence
2010-03-04 Passed As Amended
2010-03-04 Amended
2010-03-02 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2010-02-08 Referred To Appropriations
2010-02-05 Transmitted To Senate
2010-02-03 Passed As Amended
2010-02-03 Amended
2010-02-03 Committee Substitute Adopted
2010-02-02 Read the Third Time
2010-02-02 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2010-01-18 Referred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback