MS HB1048 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Statewide Program For The Registration Of Hemodialysis Technicians Under The State Board Of Health; To Prescribe The Powers Of The Board In The Registration Of Hemodialysis Technicians; To Provide That Hemodialysis Technicians May Administer Hemodialysis Under The Authority Of A Licensed Registered Nurse; To Authorize The Board To Establish Fees Necessary For The Administration Of This Section; To Repeal Section 73-15-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For Certification Of Hemodialysis Technicians By The Mississippi Board Of Nursing; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hemodialysis technicians; provide for registration under State Board of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |