MS HB1045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 77-3-725, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Maximum Civil Penalties For Violations Of The Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act; increase maximum civil penalties for violations of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Energy
2019-02-07HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Public Utilities

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback