MS HB1035 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-106-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Repayment And Conversion Terms And The Administration Of The Mississippi Dyslexia Education Forgivable Loan Program; To Amend Section 37-106-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Dyslexia Education Forgivable Loan Program; clarify repayment and conversion terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-02 | House | Passed |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Education |