MS HB1030 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "mississippi Intercollegiate Athletics Compensation Rights Act"; To Define Terminology; To Provide That A Student-athlete May Earn Compensation For The Use Of His Or Her Name, Image Or Likeness While Enrolled In A Postsecondary Institution And Obtain A Certified Agent For Matters Relating To That Compensation; To Prohibit Student-athletes From Earning Compensation In Exchange For His Or Her Ability Or Participation In Intercollegiate Athletics Or Sports Competitions; To Provide That A Student-athlete Shall Not Be Deemed An Employee Or Independent Contractor Of Any Athletic Organizational Entity Based On His Or Her Participation In An Intercollegiate Athletic Program; To Prohibit Postsecondary Educational Institutions From Upholding Requirements That Restrict A Student-athletes Ability To Receive Compensation For The Student's Name, Image Or Likeness; To Prohibit Athletic Organizational Entities From Interfering With A Contract Or Other Requirements That Prevent A Student-athlete From Receiving Compensation For His Or Her Name, Image Or Likeness Or Prevent A Postsecondary Educational Institution From Participating In An Intercollegiate Athletic Program As A Result Of The Student-athlete Receiving Compensation For His Or Her Name, Image Or Likeness; To Allow Postsecondary Educational Institutions To Impose Reasonable Limitations On The Times A Student-athlete May Participate In Certain Promotional Activities Related To The License Or Use Of The Student's Name, Image Or Likeness; To Prohibit Postsecondary Educational Institutions From Preventing Student-athletes From Obtaining Professional Representation; To Require Persons Obtained By Student-athletes As Professional Representatives To Be Registered As Athlete Agents And Attorneys Who Provide Legal Representation To Be Licensed By The Mississippi Bar Association; To Require Student-athletes To Disclose Contracts For Compensation To The Postsecondary Educational Institution Of Enrollment The Earlier Of Three Days Of Its Execution Or Three Days Of The Next Competition; To Provide That No Male

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Mississippi Intercollegiate Athletics Compensation Rights Act"; enact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 89 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-18SenateReferred To Universities and Colleges
2021-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-11HousePassed As Amended
2021-02-11HouseAmendment Withdrawn
2021-02-11HousePoint of Order Raised
2021-02-11HouseAmended
2021-02-10HouseRead the Third Time
2021-02-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-02HouseDR - TSDPAA: JA To UC
2021-01-27HouseDR - TSDP: UC To JA
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Universities and Colleges;Judiciary A

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73423Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback