MS HB1013 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Segment Of Road In Union And Lafayette Counties As An Official Scenic Byway To Be Known As The "william Faulkner Scenic Byway"; To Authorize And Direct The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Allow For The Construction Of Certain Markers Designating The Chickasa-leaf Barn Quilt Trail; To Authorize And Direct The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Allow For The Construction Of Certain Markers Recognizing The Military Order Of The Purple Heart At The Entrances Of State Highways In The Counties Of Mississippi; To Amend Section 65-41-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add Certain Segments Of Road In Desoto County As Part Of The Delta Bluffs Scenic Byway; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Scenic byway; designate certain segment in Union and Lafayette Counties as "William Faulkner Scenic Byway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Browning,Hudson |
2015-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Johnson,Massengill,Rogers (14th) |
2015-03-24 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2015-01-28 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |