MS HB1010 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-37-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Definitions For Felony Firearm Violations; To Amend Section 97-37-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Certain Weapons From The List Of Crimes Prohibited To Be In The Possession Of Those Convicted Of A Felony; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Firearms in possession of a felon; revise regulations for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
97 | 37 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 37 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |