MS HB1009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Catina Taylor, Of Marshall County, Mississippi.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suffrage; restore to Catina Faulkner Taylor of Marshall County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateDied In Committee
2019-03-25SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B
2019-03-22HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-22HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-22HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback