MS HB1008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-13-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Various Technical Amendments And Revisions To The Medicaid Services And Managed Care Provisions; To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On This Section; To Amend Section 43-13-145, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Several Technical Amendments And Revisions To The Medicaid Assessment Provisions; To Delete The Date Of The Repealer On This Section; To Amend Sections 43-13-107 And 43-13-117.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Medicaid Program, To Make Some Minor, Nonsubstantive Changes; To Bring Forward Sections 43-13-103, 43-13-105, 43-13-109, 43-13-113, 43-13-116, 43-13-120, 43-13-121, 43-13-123, 43-13-125 And 43-13-139, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Medicaid Program, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Medicaid; make technical amendments to services, manage care and assessment provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Joey Hood [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Died In Conference |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Blackwell,Wiggins,Bryan |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Hood,White,Mims |
2021-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-18 | Suspend from Deadlines by SCR535 | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Medicaid |
2021-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-02-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hood, Deweese, Clark) |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Medicaid |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 13 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 125 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 139 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 13 | 145 | New Code | See Bill Text |