MS HB1002 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Segment Of Mississippi Highway 28 Located In Copiah County, Mississippi, As The "carroll V. Hood Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial Highway; designate segment in Copiah County as the "Carroll V. Hood Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2022-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider W/Drawn |
2022-02-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Arnold, Busby, Massengill) |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2022-01-26 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |