MS HB1 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create New Section 3-3-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Official Flag Of The State Of Mississippi Shall Be The Design Recommended By The Commission To Redesign The Mississippi State Flag And Approved By The People In The Statewide Election Held On November 3, 2020; To Provide A Description Of The Design Of The State Flag And A Statement Of What The Artwork And Colors Of The Design Represent; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State flag; shall be the design recommended by the Commission to Redesign the State Flag and approved in the November 2020 election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-11 Approved by Governor
2021-01-06SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-01-06HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-01-06SenateReturned For Enrolling
2021-01-06SenateImmediate Release
2021-01-06SenatePassed
2021-01-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-05SenateReferred To Rules
2021-01-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-01-05HouseImmediate Release
2021-01-05HousePassed
2021-01-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-05HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback