MO SR90 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - S adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - S adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week of May 2, 2021, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in Missouri
Title
Designates the week of May 2, 2021, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in Missouri
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | S adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | S offered |