MO SR706 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week of May 1, 2022, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in Missouri
Title
Designates the week of May 1, 2022, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-31 | Senate | S Offered |