MO SR593 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - S adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - S adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns the unprovoked invasion of Ukraine by Russia
Title
Condemns the unprovoked invasion of Ukraine by Russia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | S adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | S Offered |