MO SJR60 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to health care, including health insurance and MO HealthNet
Title
Enacts provisions relating to health care, including health insurance and MO HealthNet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 60-Luetkemeyer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=30556754 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR60.pdf |