MO SJR45 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the Governor from controlling the rate of expenditures of, and withholding funds from, the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education and the payment of public debt

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the Governor from controlling the rate of expenditures of, and withholding funds from, the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education and the payment of public debt

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
2014-04-02HouseReferred H General Laws Committee
2014-03-03HouseH Second Read
2014-02-27HouseH First Read
2014-02-27SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-02-27SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
2014-02-27SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-02-25SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-02-25SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-02-24SenatePerfected
2014-02-24SenateSCS S adopted
2014-02-20SenateReported from S Appropriations Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-02-13SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Appropriations Committee (5583S.02C)
2014-02-10SenateHearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee
2014-02-06SenateSecond Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee
2014-01-23SenateS First Read--SJR 45-Silvey

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback