MO SJR39 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the procedures for the redistricting of the state Senate and House of Representatives districts
Title
Changes the procedures for the redistricting of the state Senate and House of Representatives districts
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 39-Dixon |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27767892 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR39.pdf |