MO SJR35 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-26 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-26 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Missouri Department of the National Guard
Title
Creates the Missouri Department of the National Guard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |