MO SJR34 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits expenditures of public funds to any person or facility, or affiliate of such, performing or inducing an abortion
Title
Prohibits expenditures of public funds to any person or facility, or affiliate of such, performing or inducing an abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |