MO SJR31 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 31-Sater
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 31-Sater
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the initiative petition process
Title
Modifies the initiative petition process
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 31-Sater |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 31-Sater |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838132 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR31.pdf |