MO SJR30 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies constitutional provisions relating to elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies constitutional provisions relating to elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
2023-04-06SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS
2023-03-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (0915S.05C)
2023-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2023-01-19SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2023-01-04SenateS First Read
2022-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback