MO SJR30 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for gubernatorial appointment of members of the nonpartisan judicial commissions
Title
Provides for gubernatorial appointment of members of the nonpartisan judicial commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |