MO SJR30 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a nonpartisan judicial commission shall submit to the Governor a list of names, rather than a list of three names, to fill a judicial vacancy in a court under the nonpartisan court plan
Title
Provides that a nonpartisan judicial commission shall submit to the Governor a list of names, rather than a list of three names, to fill a judicial vacancy in a court under the nonpartisan court plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 30-Hegeman |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246474 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR30.pdf |