MO SJR3 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading (In Fiscal Review) |
2023-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2023-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2023-04-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2023-02-13 | House | H Second Read |
2023-02-09 | House | H First Read |
2023-02-09 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2023-02-06 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Koenig)--(0738S.02F) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |