MO SJR27 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the people shall be secure in their electronic communications and data
Title
Provides that the people shall be secure in their electronic communications and data
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] | Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Rep. Paul Curtman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-03 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-01 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4379S.03C) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2014-02-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4379S.05C) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 27-Schaaf and Dixon |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |