MO SJR26 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 26-Lager, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 26-Lager, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Constitution to limit general revenue appropriations and mandate state income tax rate reductions in certain situations
Title
Amends the Constitution to limit general revenue appropriations and mandate state income tax rate reductions in certain situations
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 26-Lager, with SS & SA 1 (pending) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-08 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Sifton)--(4581S03.01S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | SS S offered (Lager)--(4581S.03F) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 26-Lager |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723577 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR26.pdf |