MO SJR21 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 21-May
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 21-May
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the Missouri Constitution relating to the consolidation of St. Louis City and St. Louis County
Title
Modifies provisions of the Missouri Constitution relating to the consolidation of St. Louis City and St. Louis County
Sponsors
Sen. Karla May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 21-May |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 21-May |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3779867 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR21.pdf |