MO SJR14 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies term limits for various elected public officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies term limits for various elected public officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: SJR 14 SJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SJR 14 SJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-07HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-06HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-30HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-30HouseReported Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials
2019-04-29HouseVoted Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials
2019-04-24HouseHearing Conducted H Elections and Elected Officials
2019-04-18HouseReferred H Elections and Elected Officials
2019-04-17HouseH Second Read
2019-04-16HouseH First Read
2019-04-16SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-04-15SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-15SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-10SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-09SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-04-09SenatePerfected
2019-04-09SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2019-04-09SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0508S04.01S)
2019-04-09SenateSS for SCS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(0508S.04F)
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-07SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS
2019-03-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SJRs 14 & 9) Local Government and Elections Committee (0508S.03C)
2019-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-24SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SJR 14-Luetkemeyer
2018-12-03SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback