MO SCR9 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for actions taken to end motorcycle profiling
Title
Expresses support for actions taken to end motorcycle profiling
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to adopt SCR withdrawn |
2021-04-29 | Senate | SA 1 S offered (Hoskins)--(1985S01.01S) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | S offered |