MO SCR8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calls on a convention for the states proposing amendments to the United States Constitution placing limits on the federal government
Title
Calls on a convention for the states proposing amendments to the United States Constitution placing limits on the federal government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | S First Read |