MO SCR8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 8-Holsman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requests Congress to call an Article V Convention of the States

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests Congress to call an Article V Convention of the States

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateResolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 8-Holsman
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-12SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-26SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-23SenateSecond Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-22SenateS First Read--SCR 8-Holsman

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback