MO SCR68 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 68-Schupp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 68-Schupp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the practice of Falun Dafa, also known as Falun Gong
Title
Expresses support for the practice of Falun Dafa, also known as Falun Gong
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Schupp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 68-Schupp |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Offered--SCR 68-Schupp |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29788242 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR68.pdf |