MO SCR65 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the third Monday of June as Ride to Work Day in Missouri
Title
Establishes the third Monday of June as Ride to Work Day in Missouri
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Referred H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Trade & Tourism |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Trade & Tourism |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted H Trade & Tourism |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Referred H Trade & Tourism |
2016-04-28 | Senate | H Second Read |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported to the House and First Read |
2016-04-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 65-Schaefer |