MO SCR6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to resist any attempt to increase the number of Justices on the United States Supreme Court
Title
Urges the United States Congress to resist any attempt to increase the number of Justices on the United States Supreme Court
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] | Rep. Sara Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House: SCR 6 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 30 NV: 12 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | H adopted |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled H Judiciary |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred H Judiciary |
2021-04-22 | Senate | H Second Read |
2021-04-21 | Senate | H First Read |
2021-04-20 | Senate | S adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | S offered |