MO SCR6 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 6-Schupp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Calls on the Chinese Government to end the practice of organ harvesting from prisoners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calls on the Chinese Government to end the practice of organ harvesting from prisoners

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateResolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 6-Schupp
2019-02-07SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-05SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-17SenateReferred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-16SenateS Offered--SCR 6-Schupp

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback