MO SCR5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Joint Committee on Solid Waste Management District Operations
Title
Establishes the Joint Committee on Solid Waste Management District Operations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House: SCR 5 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | H adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Utilities |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Utilities |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted H Utilities |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred H Utilities |
2019-02-26 | Senate | H Second Read |
2019-02-25 | Senate | H First Read |
2019-02-21 | Senate | S adopted |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 5-Wallingford |