MO SCR46 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves and suspends the final order of rulemaking for the proposed rule 19 CSR 15-8.410 Personal Care Attendant Wage Range
Title
Disapproves and suspends the final order of rulemaking for the proposed rule 19 CSR 15-8.410 Personal Care Attendant Wage Range
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House: SCR 46 VETOED SENATE BILLS (Y: 119 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: SCR 46 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: SCR 46 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Legislature voted to override Governor's veto |
2016-05-03 | House | H adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2016-04-06 | House | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2016-02-26 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-02-11 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-02-11 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-02-11 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-02-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass S Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-02-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred H Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-01-26 | House | H Second Read |
2016-01-25 | House | H First Read |
2016-01-25 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |