MO SCR41 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the use of biosimilar medicines
Title
Urges the use of biosimilar medicines
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | S Offered |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=31414654 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR41.pdf |