MO SCR41 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred H Health Care Policy Committee
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred H Health Care Policy Committee
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates November 2014 as Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease (COPD) awareness month in Missouri
Title
Designates November 2014 as Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease (COPD) awareness month in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Referred H Health Care Policy Committee |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | S adopted, as amended |
2014-05-07 | Senate | SCA 1 S adopted |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Corrected Committee Report: Reported From S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee to Floor w/SCA 1 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (w/SCA#1) S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (6452S01.01S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-02 | Senate | S Offered |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=35068145 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR41.pdf |