MO SCR41 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Joint Interim Committee on Oversight of Federal Stimulus and Stabilization Funds
Title
Creates the Joint Interim Committee on Oversight of Federal Stimulus and Stabilization Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2010-01-20 | S Offered-SCR 41-Schmitt |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3188895 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR41.pdf |