MO SCR4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the Kansas City Chiefs as the official professional football team of the state of Missouri

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates the Kansas City Chiefs as the official professional football team of the state of Missouri

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House: SCR 4 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SCR 4 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 22 NV: 16 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseSigned by Governor
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-16HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-07HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-16HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-16HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-09HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-02HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-03-27HouseReferred H General Laws
2019-03-01HouseH Second Read
2019-02-28HouseH First Read
2019-02-28SenateS Third Read and Passed, as amended
2019-02-28SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Curls)--(1387S01.01S)
2019-01-31SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-29SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-22SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-15SenateSecond Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-14SenateS First Read--SCR 4-Curls, et al

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback