MO SCR39 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred H Budget Committee
Pending: House Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred H Budget Committee
Pending: House Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of bonds for certain state and university projects
Title
Authorizes the issuance of bonds for certain state and university projects
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Referred H Budget Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-07 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Parson)--(6299S06.02S) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-04-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (6299S.06C) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S First Read |