MO SCR34 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the National Football League to award an upcoming Super Bowl to Kansas City
Title
Urges the National Football League to award an upcoming Super Bowl to Kansas City
Sponsors
Sen. Paul LeVota [D] | Sen. Paul LeVota [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | H adopted |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | S Offered |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=30703485 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR34.pdf |