MO SCR33 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Campbell, Missouri, as the Peach Capital of Missouri
Title
Designates Campbell, Missouri, as the Peach Capital of Missouri
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2022-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2022-04-26 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy |
2022-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | S adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | S Offered |